Global Patent Index - EP 0995018 A1

EP 0995018 A1 2000-04-26 - MODULAR SILENCER

Title (en)

MODULAR SILENCER

Title (de)

MODULARAUFGEBAUTER SCHALLDÄMPFER

Title (fr)

SILENCIEUX MODULAIRE

Publication

EP 0995018 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98932937 A

Priority

  • US 9813451 W
  • US 88847997 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9902826A1] A modular silencer (30) is formed by drawn pots (44, 46) as building blocks in various constructions, components, and methods. Various internal axial, lateral and reversing paths are provided together with multiple compartments and enclosures. Simplified assembly and insulation installation techniques are provided.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/04 (2006.01); F01N 1/08 (2006.01); F01N 1/14 (2006.01); F01N 3/28 (2006.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1838 (2013.01); F01N 1/04 (2013.01); F01N 1/08 (2013.01); F01N 1/085 (2013.01); F01N 1/086 (2013.01); F01N 1/089 (2013.01); F01N 1/14 (2013.01); F01N 3/2885 (2013.01); F01N 13/18 (2013.01); F01N 13/1894 (2013.01); F01N 2240/10 (2013.01); F01N 2330/08 (2013.01); F01N 2450/06 (2013.01); F01N 2450/20 (2013.01); F01N 2450/22 (2013.01); F01N 2470/16 (2013.01); F01N 2470/18 (2013.01); F01N 2470/26 (2013.01); F01N 2470/30 (2013.01); F01N 2490/04 (2013.01); F01N 2490/06 (2013.01); F01N 2490/155 (2013.01); F01N 2490/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9902826 A1 19990121; AU 8271798 A 19990208; DE 69804800 D1 20020516; DE 69804800 T2 20020822; EP 0995018 A1 20000426; EP 0995018 A4 20000719; EP 0995018 B1 20020410

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120629

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69804800

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20120629

2012-12-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69804800

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: VON ROHR PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110628

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-04-08 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-02-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2003-06-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030619

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804800

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2000-12-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20001107

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BATEMAN, RALPH

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRUMM, CRAIG, S.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CUMMINS, JIM, R., JR.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ERIKSSON, LARRY, J.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GREENER, CHARLES, M.

2000-10-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: KENDZIERA, RONALD, W.

2000-07-19 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7F 01N 7/18 A, 7F 01N 1/08 B

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000207

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB