Global patent index - EP 0995023 A1

EP 0995023 A1 2000-04-26 - POWER CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR SUCH AS AN INJECTOR OR AN ELECTROVALVE

Title (en)

POWER CONTROL CIRCUIT FOR ELECTROMAGNETIC ACTUATOR SUCH AS AN INJECTOR OR AN ELECTROVALVE

Title (de)

LEISTUNGSSTEUERSCHALTUNG FÜR EINEN ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN BETÄTIGER, WIE EINSPRITZVENTIL ODER ELEKTROMAGNETVENTIL

Title (fr)

CIRCUIT DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE POUR ACTIONNEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE TEL QU'INJECTEUR OU ELECTROVANNE

Publication

EP 0995023 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98936459 A

Priority

  • FR 9801452 W
  • FR 9708726 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2766005A1] The invention concerns a power control circuit, for powering a coil (7-10) of at least an actuator such as a fuel injector, comprising a positive booster stage connected to a low voltage power source (3), and comprising a capacitor (6) and a self-induction coil (1) designed to accumulate energy, and first switches (4) cyclically closed and opened by a control unit (16) for charging the coil (1) from the source (3) then charging the capacitor (6) from the coil (1); and finally charging several times and successively the coil (1) again before closing the second switches (11-14) to ensure the powering of at least one actuating coil (7-10) by simultaneous discharge of the capacitor (6) and the self-induction coil (1). The invention is applicable for supplying power to electromagnetic actuators such as electrovalves and injectors for internal combustion engine with direct injection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20; H01F 7/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2013.01); H01F 7/1816 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2006 (2013.01); F02D 2041/201 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2013 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2027 (2013.01); F02D 2041/389 (2013.01); H01F 2007/1822 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902834A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2766005 A1 19990115; FR 2766005 B1 19990917; DE 69804801 D1 20020516; DE 69804801 T2 20021128; EP 0995023 A1 20000426; EP 0995023 B1 20020410; WO 9902834 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070707

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080201

2006-07-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-04-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030113

2002-05-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804801

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-16

2002-04-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010725

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991206

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE IT