Global Patent Index - EP 0995024 A1

EP 0995024 A1 2000-04-26 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRO-MAGNETIC LOAD

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING AN ELECTRO-MAGNETIC LOAD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANSTEUERUNG EINES ELEKTROMAGNETISCHEN VERBRAUCHERS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR COMMANDER UN CONSOMMATEUR ELECTROMAGNETIQUE

Publication

EP 0995024 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916804 A

Priority

  • DE 9900776 W
  • DE 19813138 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813138A1] The present invention relates to a method and a device for controlling at least one electro-magnetic load, such as a magnetic valve for controlling the fuel injection in an internal combustion engine, using a control circuit that comprises electronic switching elements and at least one booster-capacitor. The control circuit comprises recharging elements (EC) for recharging the booster-capacitor, after a partial or complete discharge thereof, up to a target voltage value that influences the opening rate of the injection valve and thus the injection duration. This invention is characterised in that the recharging elements (EC) are functionally connected with members for detecting at least the speed (n) and the load (L) of the internal combustion engine, and in that they include regulation members (EC) for adjusting the recharging current intensity (ICN) required for obtaining the target voltage value as well as for adjusting the recharging duration (tCN) according to at least the speed value (n) and the load value (L) detected by said detection members.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); H01F 7/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2006 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2034 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2051 (2013.01); H01F 7/1816 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949195A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813138 A1 19990930; EP 0995024 A1 20000426; EP 0995024 B1 20031022; JP 2002500720 A 20020108; JP 4531143 B2 20100825; US 6360725 B1 20020326; WO 9949195 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110319

2012-02-23 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59907432

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100325

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907432 P 20031127

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2003-03-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030124

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT