Global patent index - EP 0995025 A1

EP 0995025 A1 2000-04-26 - METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MAINLY INTENDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (en)

METHOD FOR OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE MAINLY INTENDED FOR A MOTOR VEHICLE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE INSBESONDERE EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE NOTAMMENT POUR UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0995025 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922056 A

Priority

  • DE 9900822 W
  • DE 19813381 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813381A1] The present invention relates to an internal combustion engine (1) which is mainly intended for a motor vehicle. The engine comprises an injection valve (8) for directly injecting fuel into a combustion chamber (4) either during an inlet phase according to a first operation mode or during a compression phase according to a second operation mode. A regulation device (16) is also provided for determining the amount of air (rl) supplied to the combustion chamber (4) and for controlling and/or adjusting the amount of fuel injected into said combustion chamber (4) in a different manner for each operation mode. The regulation device (16) ensures the transition from the first operation mode to the second operation mode according to the amount of air (rl) supplied into the combustion chamber (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/307 (2013.01); F02D 41/3064 (2013.01); F02D 41/3029 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949197A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813381 A1 19991007; EP 0995025 A1 20000426; EP 0995025 B1 20030723; JP 2002500722 A 20020108; US 6240895 B1 20010605; WO 9949197 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59906342

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140523

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070322

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-07-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040426

2004-05-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-08-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59906342

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-08-28

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000330

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT