Global Patent Index - EP 0995027 A1

EP 0995027 A1 2000-04-26 - METHOD FOR MAKING A CYLINDER HEAD WITH INTEGRATED VALVE SEATS AND CYLINDER HEAD WITH INTEGRATED VALVE SEATS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR MAKING A CYLINDER HEAD WITH INTEGRATED VALVE SEATS AND CYLINDER HEAD WITH INTEGRATED VALVE SEATS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES ZYLINDERKOPFES MIT INTEGRIERTEN VENTILSITZE UND DER ZYLINDERKOPF

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UNE CULASSE A SIEGES DE SOUPAPE INTEGRES ET CULASSE A SIEGES DE SOUPAPE INTEGRES

Publication

EP 0995027 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98930847 A

Priority

  • FR 9801232 W
  • FR 9708806 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765915A1] The invention concerns a method comprising the following steps: obtaining a cylinder head made of a light unrefined foundry alloy comprising valve seat zones; carrying out a transferred plasma arc deposition on the seat zones of a coating layer of an alloy with the following composition, in w.t. %: Ni 13-20, Mo 2-8, Co 0-10, Fe 2-8, Si 2-4, B 1-3, Cu the remainder; machining the coat to obtain the desired shape and surface texture for the integrated valve seats: The invention is applicable to internal combustion engine aluminium cylinder heads.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 1/24; F01L 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 3/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 1/24 (2013.01); F01L 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902839A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765915 A1 19990115; FR 2765915 B1 19990827; DE 69812101 D1 20030417; DE 69812101 T2 20031120; EP 0995027 A1 20000426; EP 0995027 B1 20030312; ES 2194329 T3 20031116; WO 9902839 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070613

2008-09-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070613

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2006-06-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2194329 T3

2003-09-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69812101 P 20030417

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2003-03-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030312

2002-08-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: RENAULT S.A.S.

2001-01-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001215

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BEN ABDALLAH, ADEL

2000-07-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CACHOT, PHILIPPE

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000112

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT