Global Patent Index - EP 0995030 A1

EP 0995030 A1 2000-04-26 - DIRECT INJECTION FUEL PUMP FOR ENGINE WITH CONTROLLED IGNITION AND INJECTION SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME

Title (en)

DIRECT INJECTION FUEL PUMP FOR ENGINE WITH CONTROLLED IGNITION AND INJECTION SYSTEM COMPRISING SAME

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFFDIREKTEINSPRITZPUMPE FÜR FREMDGEZÜNDETE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE UND MIT SOLCHER PUMPE AUSGESTATTETES EINSPRITZSYSTEM

Title (fr)

POMPE D'INJECTION DIRECTE DE COMBUSTIBLE POUR MOTEUR A ALLUMAGE COMMANDE ET SYSTEME D'INJECTION COMPORTANT UNE TELLE POMPE

Publication

EP 0995030 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 98936458 A

Priority

  • FR 9801451 W
  • FR 9708595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2765635A1] The invention concerns an injection pump comprising, in a housing (10), at least a chamber (12) supplying an injection circuit, separated by a deformable membrane (18) from a section (26) defined by a bore (28) of the housing and by a piston (30) actuated by a reciprocating movement. The chamber (12) is connected to a fuel supply and to the injection circuit by respective non-return valves. The pressure of the liquid contained in the section is permanently adjustable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/14; F04B 43/067

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/30 (2006.01); F02M 37/04 (2006.01); F02M 37/12 (2006.01); F02M 59/14 (2006.01); F04B 43/067 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/14 (2013.01); F02M 37/046 (2013.01); F02M 37/12 (2013.01); F04B 43/067 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9902851A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE IT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2765635 A1 19990108; FR 2765635 B1 19990903; DE 69804460 D1 20020502; DE 69804460 T2 20021114; EP 0995030 A1 20000426; EP 0995030 B1 20020327; JP 2002508047 A 20020312; US 6178951 B1 20010130; WO 9902851 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160725

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-03-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021230

2002-05-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69804460 20020502

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE IT

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010704

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000113

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE IT