Global Patent Index - EP 0995040 A1

EP 0995040 A1 2000-04-26 - FAN

Title (en)

FAN

Title (de)

LÜFTER

Title (fr)

VENTILATEUR

Publication

EP 0995040 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99932636 A

Priority

  • DE 9901360 W
  • DE 19821833 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19821833A1] The fan has an impeller (11) and an electric motor (12) driving it. The motor has a stator (13) and a rotor (16) fixed to an output shaft (21). The rotor is designed as an outside rotor with a bell-shaped pole housing (17) overlapping the stator. The impeller is fixed to the pole housing and overlaps this axially, at least partially. It touches the outer sleeve of the pole housing at several places. These contact places of the impeller lie at those places of the pole housing in which the largest vibration amplitudes occur, and lie along the bell edge of the pole housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/06 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 25/0613 (2013.01); F04D 29/668 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9960277A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19821833 A1 19991118; BR 9906449 A 20000926; EP 0995040 A1 20000426; EP 0995040 B1 20050302; ES 2238840 T3 20050901; JP 2002515569 A 20020528; JP 4294866 B2 20090715; KR 100553465 B1 20060222; KR 20010014126 A 20010226; US 6488485 B1 20021203; WO 9960277 A1 19991125

INPADOC legal status


2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130507

2015-07-10 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150710

2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130531

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130506

2014-03-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130506

2014-02-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911687

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131203

2014-01-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130506

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120525

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120723

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-09-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120522

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20120608

- Year of fee payment: 14

2006-02-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051205

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2238840 T3

2005-07-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050615

2005-04-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911687 P 20050407

2005-03-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000525

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT