Global Patent Index - EP 0995066 A1

EP 0995066 A1 2000-04-26 - ARRANGEMENT OF BURNERS FOR HEATING INSTALLATION, IN PARTICULAR A GAS TURBINE COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (en)

ARRANGEMENT OF BURNERS FOR HEATING INSTALLATION, IN PARTICULAR A GAS TURBINE COMBUSTION CHAMBER

Title (de)

BRENNERANORDNUNG FÜR EINE FEUERUNGSANLAGE, INSBESONDERE EINE GASTURBINENBRENNKAMMER

Title (fr)

AGENCEMENT DE BRULEURS POUR UNE INSTALLATION DE CHAUFFE, NOTAMMENT UNE CHAMBRE DE COMBUSTION DE TURBINE A GAZ

Publication

EP 0995066 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98943638 A

Priority

  • DE 9801871 W
  • DE 19730734 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904196A1] The invention concerns an arrangement of burners for a heating installation, in particular a gas turbine combustion chamber, comprising a main burner (1) and a pilot flame for lighting and/or stabilising the main burner (1). Said pilot flame is permanently or temporarily used as premix burner, and a supply system (6, 7, 8, 9) in the form of a pipe for supplying fuel and combustion air, said system including at least an air duct (6) with a more or less circular cross-section, and which is provided with intakes (10; 11) for the fuel. In the direction of the air flow upstream of said intakes (10; 11) which are arranged preferably at regular intervals on the periphery of the air duct (6), a vortex generator (12) is provided in the air duct (6). The latter acts as diffuser (13) at its end zone emerging into the heating installation and with in particular an end zone (13) ever widening in cross-section and also capable of being cooled. The vortex generator (12) upstream of the fuel intakes (10; 11) ensures stable and safe functioning of the pilot flame with slight production of NOx.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 17/00; F23D 11/02; F23D 14/26; F23D 14/82; F23R 3/14; F23R 3/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23R 3/30 (2006.01); F23C 99/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/12 (2006.01); F23D 14/02 (2006.01); F23D 14/24 (2006.01); F23D 14/26 (2006.01); F23D 14/82 (2006.01); F23D 17/00 (2006.01); F23D 23/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/14 (2006.01); F23R 3/28 (2006.01); F23R 3/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/26 (2013.01); F23D 14/02 (2013.01); F23D 14/82 (2013.01); F23D 17/002 (2013.01); F23D 23/00 (2013.01); F23R 3/14 (2013.01); F23R 3/286 (2013.01); F23R 3/343 (2013.01); F23D 2206/10 (2013.01); F23R 2900/03343 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904196A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904196 A1 19990128; EP 0995066 A1 20000426; EP 0995066 B1 20010926; JP 2001510885 A 20010807

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160707

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160707

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160707

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59801583

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150715

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150918

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150709

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-07-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-09-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-03-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011213

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801583 20011031

2001-09-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010319

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI