Global Patent Index - EP 0995073 A1

EP 0995073 A1 2000-04-26 - ANTI-PERSONNEL MINE FOOT PROTECTION SYSTEMS

Title (en)

ANTI-PERSONNEL MINE FOOT PROTECTION SYSTEMS

Title (de)

SCHUTZVORRICHTUNG FÜR FÜSSE GEGEN ANTIPERSONENMINEN

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES DE PROTECTION DU PIED CONTRE LES MINES ANTIPERSONNELLES

Publication

EP 0995073 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98933419 A

Priority

  • CA 9800694 W
  • CA 2210868 A
  • US 6347398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904216A1] A system (100) to provide foot protection against anti-personnel land mines is designed for use by mine clearance personnel and includes a raised frame having a central foot support location thereon which ensures a spacing of the wearer's foot above the ground surface of from 10 to 30 cm. The ground-engaging parts (102, 103) of the frame are spaced forwardly and rearwardly of the foot location (105) and the frame includes on its underside blast protection material (128, 130), the combined results of these measures being to greatly attenuate the blast and fragmentation effects of an exploding mine on the foot of the user. Moreover, the underside of the structure, including legs (102, 103), is aerodynamically shaped to deflect the blast wave loading and fragments generated by the mine detonation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/0026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904216A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904216 A1 19990128; WO 9904216 A9 20000316; AU 8330098 A 19990210; DE 69814640 D1 20030618; DE 69814640 T2 20040325; EP 0995073 A1 20000426; EP 0995073 B1 20030514

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-06-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALLEN-VANGUARD CORP., OTTOWA, CA

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALLEN-VANGUARD TECHNOLOGIES INC., OTTAWA, ONTARIO, CA

- Document: DE 69814640

- Effective date: 20110406

2011-04-13 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20110317 AND 20110323

2011-02-25 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2009-01-09 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2009-01-09 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-07-16 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2004-07-16 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2004-05-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040217

2004-04-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-03-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69814640 P 20030618

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010613

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000125

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB