Global Patent Index - EP 0995180 A2

EP 0995180 A2 2000-04-26 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING LIGHT SIGNAL INSTALLATIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH TRAFFIC FLOWS

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING LIGHT SIGNAL INSTALLATIONS IN ACCORDANCE WITH TRAFFIC FLOWS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERKEHRSABHÄNGIGEN STEUERUNG VON LICHTSIGNALANLAGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'INSTALLATIONS DE FEUX DE SIGNALISATION EN FONCTION DE LA CIRCULATION ROUTIERE

Publication

EP 0995180 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98946224 A

Priority

  • DE 9801917 W
  • DE 19729394 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903082A2] When light signal installations (2) are controlled by means of control apparatus (1) in accordance with road traffic flows it is desirable that quality control be carried out. The data reaching the control apparatus (1) are too numerous to be continuously transmitted to a road traffic computer (5). When planning road traffic a desired state of the control apparatus (1) is defined by means of desired ranges for critical parameters such as, for example, the periods buses wait at light signal installations. If data which are detected by detectors (3), transmitted to the control apparatus (3) and stored in a memory unit (7) are outside the desired ranges, a status message is transmitted from the control apparatus (1) to the road traffic computer (5). On the basis of the status message an improved control programme is established in the road traffic computer (5) and transmitted to the control apparatus (1) for implementation. The invention also relates to the control of light signal installations in accordance with road traffic flows.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/081 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/081 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903082A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903082 A2 19990121; WO 9903082 A3 19990401; AT 214827 T 20020415; EP 0995180 A2 20000426; EP 0995180 B1 20020320

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080919

- Year of fee payment: 11

2003-03-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-12-27 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-09-18 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-09-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-07-09 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020709

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803442 20020425

2002-03-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2002-03-20 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020320

2002-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214827 T 20020415

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010808

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL