Global Patent Index - EP 0995193 A2

EP 0995193 A2 2000-04-26 - SEMI-MANUFACTURED STAMPER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (en)

SEMI-MANUFACTURED STAMPER AND METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THE SAME

Title (de)

HALFERTIGSTEMPEL UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

MATRICE DE PRESSAGE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE CETTE MATRICE

Publication

EP 0995193 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 98934101 A

Priority

  • SE 9801387 W
  • SE 9702734 A
  • SE 9703480 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904393A2] The invention relates to a stamper for replication of optical discs and to a method of obtaining such a stamper. The method comprises the steps of: a) obtaining a substantially disc-shaped member (100) having a first surface (105; 106); and a second surface (112) forming a back surface of the semi-manufactured stamper; said first surface being provided with a guide track (6; 6') for indicating structurable surface portions (106') of said member (100; 130); said structurable surface portions (106') being flat and substantially unstructured; b) applying a layer (120; 240;) sensitive to irradiation on said first surface (105) such that an unexposed and exposable semi-manufactured stamper is provided; c) enclosing the unexposed semi-manufactured stamper in a protective package such that the sensitive film is maintained substantially unexposed; and d) treating (S30) the semi-manufactured stamper, before performing step c), said treatment including: d1) treating said second surface (112) of the semi-manufactured stamper such that a mean surface deviation value (Rz) below (2) micrometer is obtained.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G11B 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G11B 7/26 (2013.01); G11B 7/261 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904393A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904393 A2 19990128; WO 9904393 A3 19990422; WO 9904393 B1 19990527; AU 8370098 A 19990210; CN 1264487 A 20000823; DE 69811896 D1 20030410; EP 0995193 A2 20000426; EP 0995193 B1 20030305; SE 9703480 D0 19970925

INPADOC legal status


2008-10-29 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20080623

2007-04-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070201

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060715

2007-03-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070201

2006-07-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060716

2006-07-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060715

2005-07-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050722

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-07-18 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050718

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-06-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050627

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ODME B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

2004-09-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: SINGULUS MASTERING B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2004-07-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2004-04-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: KOCHKA TECHNOLOGY SAS C/O GANIL

2004-01-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-01-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: KOCHKA TECHNOLOGY SAS C/O GANIL

- Effective date: 20031204

2003-09-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2003-06-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2003-06-06 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69811896

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-10

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-03-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2003-03-05 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030305

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BILLMAN, AKE

2002-07-10 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: OEHMAN, OVE

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: OTB GROUP B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ODME INTERNATIONAL B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000114

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE