Global Patent Index - EP 0995205 A1

EP 0995205 A1 2000-04-26 - MULTI-LAYER PLANAR INDUCTANCE COIL AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (en)

MULTI-LAYER PLANAR INDUCTANCE COIL AND A METHOD FOR PRODUCING THE SAME

Title (de)

MULTILAYER-PLANARINDUKTIVITÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINER SOLCHEN

Title (fr)

BOBINE D'INDUCTANCE PLANAIRE MULTICOUCHE ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION

Publication

EP 0995205 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98940208 A

Priority

  • DE 19729547 A
  • DE 19802473 A
  • EP 9804310 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903117A1] The invention relates to a multi-layer planar inductance coil on a partial area of a first plate-shaped support (10). Said support has a plurality of first conducting layers (14), said conducting layers running essentially parallel to one another. The support is configured for supporting and contacting further electronic components. At least one conducting layer (14) of the first support is arranged in the device to interact with a core (24), said conducting layer forming a first electrical winding. Said core is provided for guiding a magnetic flux and is to be located in the partial area. At least one second plate-shaped support (20; 22; 44; 54) with a plurality of second conducting layers (16; 18) is located in the partial area, said conducting layers running essentially parallel to one another. The second support is arranged so that it is parallel to the first support (10) to the extent that at least one conducting layer (16) of said second support is able to interact inductively with the core (24) and the first electrical winding, said conducting layer (16) forming a second electrical winding.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 27/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/2804 (2013.01); H01F 2027/2809 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903117A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903117 A1 19990121; DE 29824187 U1 20001019; DE 59813780 D1 20061207; EP 0995205 A1 20000426; EP 0995205 B1 20061025; US 6369685 B1 20020409

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120710

2013-03-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120710

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110721

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090203

2007-10-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070726

2007-07-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070129

2006-12-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59813780 P 20061207

2006-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2006-10-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040601

2001-01-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: POWER-ONE AG

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991211

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB