Global Patent Index - EP 0995209 A1

EP 0995209 A1 2000-04-26 - CAPACITOR SWITCHING CONTACTOR

Title (en)

CAPACITOR SWITCHING CONTACTOR

Title (de)

KONDENSATORSCHÜTZ

Title (fr)

CONTACTEUR DE COMMUTATION POUR CONDENSATEUR

Publication

EP 0995209 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98936256 A

Priority

  • DE 9801772 W
  • DE 19729595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19729595C1] A capacitor switching contactor (17) with standard contactor (16) comprising the main contact an axillary switch (11) with leading or advanced auxiliary contact relative to the main contacts to which in each case at least one resistance wire (14) is connected in series and in which the series circuit of an auxiliary contact and at least one resistance wire is connected parallel by phase to a main contact in each case. Input and output terminals are provided for electrical coupling of the series circuits to the main contacts. The input terminals and the output terminals are combined into one input terminal block (12) or output terminal block (13) in one housing (18) which has mutually insulated chambers (19) in which one terminal (20) is positioned in each case. The terminal (20) is electrically connected to a resistance wire (14) and is brought out of the housing (18) of the input- (12) or output- (13) terminal blocks for connection to the auxiliary switch (11) with its residual length accommodated in the housing (14).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/42; H01H 50/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/54 (2006.01); H01H 50/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/545 (2013.01); H01H 50/543 (2013.01); H01H 50/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903120A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19729595 C1 19981022; CN 1139952 C 20040225; CN 1262774 A 20000809; EP 0995209 A1 20000426; EP 0995209 B1 20011212; US 6285271 B1 20010904; WO 9903120 A1 19990121

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160819

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160615

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-06-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-05-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59802453 20020124

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT