Global Patent Index - EP 0995216 A1

EP 0995216 A1 2000-04-26 - CATHODE RAY TUBE COMPRISING AN ELECTRON GUN

Title (en)

CATHODE RAY TUBE COMPRISING AN ELECTRON GUN

Title (de)

KATHODENSTRAHLRÖHRE MIT EINER ELEKTRONENKANONE

Title (fr)

TUBE A RAYONS CATHODIQUES EQUIPE D'UN CANON A ELECTRONS

Publication

EP 0995216 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914704 A

Priority

  • EP 99914704 A
  • EP 98201524 A
  • IB 9900772 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959181A1] A cathode ray tube comprises an electron gun with means for generating electron beams. External magnetic fields influence the electron beams and reduce the picture quality. An electrode of the gun includes a part made of a soft-magnetic material, which extends transversely to the electron beams, and two parts, situated to the left and to the right of the electron beams, which extend along said electron beams. Together these parts form a magnetic circuit. Preferably, these parts are strongly magnetically coupled, for example, because they are interconnected or very closely spaced. Interaction of the magnetic circuit formed by said three parts with an external magnetic field causes a Lorentz force on the electron beams. The resultant deviations in the paths of the electron beams largely compensate for the deviations in the paths of the electron beams caused by the effect of the external magnetic field between the electron gun and the display screen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 29/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/50 (2006.01); H01J 29/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/484 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959181A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959181 A1 19991118; DE 69910938 D1 20031009; DE 69910938 T2 20040715; EP 0995216 A1 20000426; EP 0995216 B1 20030903; JP 2002515633 A 20020528; TW 392190 B 20000601; US 6239542 B1 20010529

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051230

2005-12-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050429

2004-10-29 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-06-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040615

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040429

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-04-27 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040427

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69910938 P 20031009

2003-10-08 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20030911

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-03 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030903

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020607

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL