Global patent index - EP 0995218 A1

EP 0995218 A1 2000-04-26 - PLASMA TREATER SYSTEMS

Title (en)

PLASMA TREATER SYSTEMS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR PLASMABEHANDLUNG

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES DE TRAITEMENT PAR PLASMA

Publication

EP 0995218 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98930963 A

Priority

  • IB 9801058 W
  • US 5241797 P
  • US 94771697 A
  • US 94771497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9904411A1] Continuous-feed plasma treater systems are designed to treat continuous, such as webs or films, by continuously feeding the substrates through an enclosure having a plasma discharge that alters the substrate's surface properties in some desirable fashion. The plasma discharges are generated by one or more electrode assemblies housed within the enclosure. In general, the plasma treater systems of the present invention have one or more cylinder-sleeve electrode assemblies and/or one or more cylindrical cavity electrode assemblies. A cylinder-sleeve electrode assembly comprises a cylinder electrode and a sleeve electrode positioned with its concave face facing and substantially parallel to the cylinder electrode to form an annular gap between the outer surface of the cylinder electrode and the inner surface of the sleeve electrode. The electrode assembly is adapted to be excited to generate a plasma within the annular gap to form a primary plasma discharge zone for exposure of the plasma to a substrate. A cylindrical cavity electrode assembly comprises (1) a cavity electrode, having a cylindrical bore and a wall slot running parallel to the cylindrical bore and exposing the cylindrical bore; (2) a cylinder electrode coaxially positioned within the cylindrical bore of the cavity electrode to form an annular gap between the outer surface of the cylinder electrode and the surface of the cylindrical bore, the annular gap forming a primary plasma discharge zone; and (3) a treater drum positioned adjacent to the wall slot of the cavity electrode. During operations, the substrate is translated past the wall slot by the treater drum and exposed to plasma species that are convected from the primary plasma discharge zone to the wall slot. Plasma treater systems of the present invention can be used (a) to treat substrates in an efficient cost-effective manner and (b) to produce treated substrates having superior surface properties as compared to those generated using prior-art systems, such as corona-type discharge systems.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 37/32; B05D 3/14; B29C 59/14; C23C 16/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B29C 59/14 (2006.01); C23C 16/40 (2006.01); C23C 16/509 (2006.01); C23C 16/54 (2006.01); H01J 37/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 37/32082 (2013.01); B29C 59/14 (2013.01); C23C 16/402 (2013.01); C23C 16/509 (2013.01); C23C 16/545 (2013.01); H01J 37/32541 (2013.01); H01J 37/3277 (2013.01); B01J 2219/0894 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9904411A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9904411 A1 19990128; AU 742051 B2 20011213; AU 8123498 A 19990210; CA 2295729 A1 19990128; EP 0995218 A1 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050531

2005-02-02 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PLASMA TREATER SYSTEMS

2004-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UNIVERSITY OF TENNESSEE RESEARCH FOUNDATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021227

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SPENCE, PAUL

2000-07-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LYNCH, JOHN

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000211

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT