Global Patent Index - EP 0995239 A1

EP 0995239 A1 2000-04-26 - APPARATUS FOR FORMING A CONNECTION THROUGH A BOARD

Title (en)

APPARATUS FOR FORMING A CONNECTION THROUGH A BOARD

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER VERBINDUNG DURCH EINE PLATTE

Title (fr)

APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE FORMER UNE CONNEXION A TRAVERS UNE CARTE

Publication

EP 0995239 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98928488 A

Priority

  • EP 98928488 A
  • EP 97111702 A
  • IB 9801035 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9903173A1] An apparatus is specified for through-plating a board (1), in particular a circuit board, having electric contacts (6, 7) which extend from one side of the board (1) to the other, having a receptacle (4), arranged on one side of the board, for an electric plug (14) with a screen (16), and having contacts for making contact with the screen, which likewise extend through the board (1). The contacts for making contact with the screen are constructed in two parts, the first part comprises a contact pin, a press-in zone for pressing into a bore in the board (1) and an extended region (23) adjacent to the press-in zone, and the second part (26) is held in an outer wall (19, 20) of the receptacle (4) and has a first resilient region (28) for making contact with the extended region (23) of the first part and a second resilient region (27) for making contact with the screen (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 12/16; H01R 12/22; H01R 13/658; H01R 23/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/658 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/65802 (2013.01); H01R 12/716 (2013.01); H01R 12/724 (2013.01); H01R 23/6873 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9903173A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9903173 A1 19990121; AU 8030998 A 19990208; DE 69804314 D1 20020425; DE 69804314 T2 20020905; EP 0995239 A1 20000426; EP 0995239 B1 20020320

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2003-03-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021223

2002-07-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804314

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-25

2002-03-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-04-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01R 12/16 A, 7H 01R 13/658 B

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991220

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB