Global Patent Index - EP 0995245 A1

EP 0995245 A1 2000-04-26 - SPARK PLUG FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

SPARK PLUG FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

ZÜNDKERZE FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

BOUGIE DESTINEE A UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 0995245 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911598 A

Priority

  • DE 9900396 W
  • DE 19818214 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19818214A1] The spark plug has a rod-shaped conductor arrangement consisting of a contact bolt, a current limiting resistor (13), a contact pin (15) and a middle electrode (16). The current limiting resistor consists of two regions of different cross-section. The cross-section in the region facing combustion is smaller than the cross-section in the region facing away from combustion. The region of the resistor facing away from combustion may lie outside the foot region of the spark plug.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 13/41

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/20 (2006.01); H01T 13/41 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 13/41 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9956363A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19818214 A1 19991028; BR 9906395 A 20000926; EP 0995245 A1 20000426; EP 0995245 B1 20010627; JP 2002509638 A 20020326; US 6380664 B1 20020430; WO 9956363 A1 19991104

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070212

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070212

2006-02-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-02-12 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050212

2002-06-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20010910

2001-09-20 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2001-08-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900137

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-08-02

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-08-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-06-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT