Global patent index - EP 0995306 A1

EP 0995306 A1 2000-04-26 - AN IMPROVED HIGH RESOLUTION VIDEO CAMERA

Title (en)

AN IMPROVED HIGH RESOLUTION VIDEO CAMERA

Title (de)

VERBESSERTE HOCHAUFLÖSENDE VIDEOKAMERA

Title (fr)

CAMERA VIDEO A HAUTE RESOLUTION AMELIOREE

Publication

EP 0995306 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99920949 A

Priority

  • GB 9901216 W
  • GB 9809910 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959332A1] A high resolution video camera (10) is disclosed in which image data is received is compressed and encoded using a wavelet compression algorithm, for example MPEG4 compression standard and which can be interfaced with an ATM network to allow transmission of the image data along the network.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 5/225

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/225 (2006.01); H04N 5/232 (2006.01); H04N 5/222 (2006.01); H04N 7/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/225 (2013.01); H04N 5/232 (2013.01); H04N 5/222 (2013.01); H04N 19/63 (2014.11)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9959332A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959332 A1 19991118; AU 3833399 A 19991129; CN 1273739 A 20001115; DE 995306 T1 20010111; EP 0995306 A1 20000426; GB 9809910 D0 19980708

INPADOC legal status

2004-06-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20031202

2001-01-11 [DET] DE: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS

- Ref Legal Event Code: DET

2000-11-01 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

2000-10-20 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EL

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-05-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAXALL LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE