Global Patent Index - EP 0995371 A1

EP 0995371 A1 2000-04-26 - Office-chair with a seat adjustable in inclination

Title (en)

Office-chair with a seat adjustable in inclination

Title (de)

Bürostuhl mit einer Sitzneigungsverstellung

Title (fr)

Chaise de bureau avec assise réglable en inclinaison

Publication

EP 0995371 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120668 A

Priority

DE 19849522 A

Abstract (en)

The incline adjustment is through an eccentric rotary shaft which has a handle part (10) rotatable relative to the function part (11) of the rotary shaft. A releasable locking engagement is set between the function part and the support frame and in the non-engaged state blocks the rotary angle adjustment of the function part. The incline adjustment is through an eccentric rotary shaft which has a handle part (10) rotatable relative to the function part (11) of the rotary shaft. A releasable locking engagement is set between the function part and the support frame and in the non-engaged state blocks the rotary angle adjustment of the function part. A first rotary angle area of adjustment executed by the user on the handle part is converted by a conversion gear into a release movement of the locking engagement. A subsequent second rotary angle area of the rotary angle adjustment causes through a follower stop between the handle and function part a similar rotary angle adjustment of the function part.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Bürostuhl mit einer Exzenterverstellung der Neigung des Sitzflächenträgers. Zur Gewährleistung unerwünschter Neigungsverstellungen wird vorgeschlagen, für die Exzenterverstellung eine Drehwelle mit einem Handhabungsteil und einem Funktionsteil zu verwenden und mittels des Handhabungsteils in einem ersten Drehwinkelbereich einen ausrückbaren Sperreingriff zu steuern, der im nicht-ausgerückten Zustand jede Drehwinkelverstellung des Funktionsteils der Drehwelle blockiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/024; A47C 1/026

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/024 (2006.01); A47C 1/026 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/024 (2013.01); A47C 1/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[A] US 4008920 A 19770222 - ARNDT O HAROLD

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995371 A1 20000426; EP 0995371 B1 20030402; DE 19849522 A1 20000427; US 6283549 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-12-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904823 P 20030508

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI