Global Patent Index - EP 0995372 A1

EP 0995372 A1 2000-04-26 - Office chair with a tracking backrest

Title (en)

Office chair with a tracking backrest

Title (de)

Bürostuhl mit einer nachführbaren Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Chaise de bureau avec un dossier suivant

Publication

EP 0995372 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120681 A

Priority

  • DE 19849521 A
  • DE 29819143 U

Abstract (en)

The backrest of the office chair swivels about a horizontal axis and has an associated resetting spring in the form of a mechanical coil compression spring (14) which is mounted between a pressure bearing (10) associated with the backrest support (6), and a pressure bearing (13) associated with the seat support (5). A plunger piston (21) fixed on the pressure bearing is mounted coaxial in the coil compression spring and runs in a plunger sleeve (20) fixed on the other pressure bearing. The piston has radially outwardly aligned locking stops (26, 27) which in the extended position sit on the circumferential edge of the sleeve (20). The locking stops are formed by the end pieces of an expanding scissors.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Bürostuhl mit einer den Bewegungen des Oberkörpers des Sitzbenutzers nachführbaren Rückenlehne. Zum Zwecke des besseren dynamischen Sitzens wird vorgeschlagen, die Rückstellfeder der Rückenlehne bzw. des Rückenlehnenträgers in Form einer mechanischen Schraubendruckfeder auszuführen, in derem Inneren koaxial ein Tauchkolben (21) vorhanden ist, der in einer Tauchhülse (20) läuft, wobei der Tauchkolben (21) radial nach außen ausstellbare Arretier - anschläge (28,29) besitzt, die im ausgestellten Zustand und in einer weitgehend ausgefahrenen Position des Tauchkolbens (21) auf dem Umfangsrand der Tauchhülse (20) aufsitzen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/032; A47C 3/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/032 (2006.01); A47C 3/03 (2006.01); A47C 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/03294 (2013.01); A47C 1/03255 (2013.01); A47C 1/03266 (2013.01); A47C 1/03272 (2013.01); A47C 3/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995372 A1 20000426; EP 0995372 B1 20030409; DE 19849521 A1 20000427; DE 29819143 U1 19990211; DE 59904932 D1 20030515; US 6283548 B1 20010904

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091031

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2010-05-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-05-26 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081030

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20081029

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040112

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI NL

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000913

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI