Global Patent Index - EP 0995377 A1

EP 0995377 A1 2000-04-26 - Working chair

Title (en)

Working chair

Title (de)

Arbeitsstuhl

Title (fr)

Chaise de travail

Publication

EP 0995377 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810952 A

Priority

CH 212098 A

Abstract (en)

The office chair has an arm rest support (11) designed to hold a handbag. The armrest can be formed by a handbag resting on a support. The armrest support can support both an arm rest and a handbag (15). A coupling part for the loop of a handbag or mobile telephone can be provided on the armrest support.

Abstract (de)

Der Arbeitsstuhl besitzt säulenförmige Armlehnenträger (13), welche normalerweise der Aufnahme einer Armlehne dienen. Auf mindestens einer Seite des Arbeitsstuhls trägt aber der Armlehnenträger (11) anstelle einer Armlehne eine Handtasche (15). Diese weist beispielsweise eine Tasche (17) auf, in welche der Armlehnenträger (11) eingreifen kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 7/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/62 (2006.01); A47C 7/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/62 (2013.01); A47C 7/70 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995377 A1 20000426; US 6257661 B1 20010710

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021031

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE LI

2000-06-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000422

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI