Global patent index - EP 0995392 A1

EP 0995392 A1 2000-04-26 - Device for winding the electrical cable of an electrical household appliance

Title (en)

Device for winding the electrical cable of an electrical household appliance

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Aufwickeln eines elektrischen Kabels für elektrisches Haushaltsgerät

Title (fr)

Enrouleur de cordon électrique pour appareils électroménager

Publication

EP 0995392 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99420204 A

Priority

FR 9812846 A

Abstract (en)

The cord winder has a drum (2) with the hub radially extended by a disc with a rim (10) carrying two side cheeks (12a,12b) forming a winding drum. The drum is locked by a brake which is released by an external pedal (16), allowing the spring inside the winder to wind in the cord. The brake is mounted so that it floats between the pedal and the brake release.

Abstract (fr)

Enrouleur (1) de cordon électrique pour appareil électroménager, notamment un aspirateur, comprenant un tambour (2) comportant un moyeu prolongé radialement par un disque portant en sa périphérie une jante (10) bordée de part et d'autre par un flasque (12a, 12b) constituant, avec la jante (10), une zone annulaire d'enroulement et de retenue du cordon électrique, ledit enrouleur (1) comprenant également un moyen de rappel élastique fixé de telle sorte à être tendu par la rotation du tambour (2) lors du déroulement du cordon, un assemblage de blocage du tambour (2) comportant un frein prévu pour empêcher le tambour (2) de l'enrouleur (1) de tourner dans le sens de l'enroulement du cordon électrique, ainsi qu'une pédale de commande (16) prévue pour coopérer avec l'assemblage de blocage du tambour, ledit frein étant agencé dans l'espace intérieur défini par la jante et susceptible d'être appliqué contre ladite jante ou retiré à l'aide de l'organe de commande, caractérisé en ce que le frein est monté flottant entre l'organe de commande et une pièce d'interaction solidaire de l'appareil électroménager. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47L 9/26; B65H 75/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/26 (2006.01); B65H 75/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/4431 (2013.01); A47L 9/26 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2784281 A1 20000414; FR 2784281 B1 20001124; DE 69930097 D1 20060427; DE 69930097 T2 20061026; EP 0995392 A1 20000426; EP 0995392 B1 20060301

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151102

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-02 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-08-09 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69930097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20101012

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071008

2007-07-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-06-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-05-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2007-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20061204

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-09 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061009

2006-06-20 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2006-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69930097

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-04-27

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2006-03-01 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060301

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT NL SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001010

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI