Global patent index - EP 0995415 A3

EP 0995415 A3 2001-01-10 - Control device for power-assistance devices for motorised wheelchairs

Title (en)

Control device for power-assistance devices for motorised wheelchairs

Title (de)

Ansteuervorrichtung für Hilfsantriebsvorrichtungen für Selbstfahrer-Rollstühle

Title (fr)

Dispositif de commande pour un système d'assistance de fauteuil roulant motorisé

Publication

EP 0995415 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99118914 A

Priority

DE 19848530 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19848530C1] The control device has a housing (14) attached to the rim (12) of the running wheel (10) of the self-propelled wheelchair, containing a pivoted armature (16) attached to a grip ring (13) for the running wheel, the armature pivot position detected by a sensor (28), for corresponding control of the drive output of the auxiliary drive device.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/02; A61G 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/04 (2013.01); A61G 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/045 (2013.01); A61G 5/048 (2016.11); A61G 5/02 (2013.01); A61G 5/1032 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[AD] EP 0832632 A2 19980401 - YAMAHA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848530 C1 20000217; EP 0995415 A2 20000426; EP 0995415 A3 20010110

INPADOC legal status

2008-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080410

2005-04-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ULRICH ALBER GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2004-05-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040414

2003-07-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ULRICH ALBER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ULRICH ALBER GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI