Global Patent Index - EP 0995416 A2

EP 0995416 A2 2000-04-26 - Wheelchair

Title (en)

Wheelchair

Title (de)

Rollstuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil roulant

Publication

EP 0995416 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99115865 A

Priority

CH 211298 A

Abstract (en)

The wheelchair (10) has at least one foot support (24). At least each side of the wheelchair which has no foot support has the longitudinal side frame member (12) projecting forwards from the vertical center plane of the wheelchair more than to the rear of the vertical plane. In another form, the lateral frame member is set so that, at least at the side of the wheelchair (10) without a foot support (24), the space in front of the seat and under the leading end of the seat is free so that the wheelchair (10) can be paddled forwards by the user's feet in a toddler action.

Abstract (de)

Der Rollstuhl (10) weist in einer ersten Ausführung einen Rahmen auf, der zwei seitliche Rahmen-Längsteile (12) umfasst, auf welchen eine Sitzfläche (27) abgestützt ist. Der Rollstuhl (10) weist wenigstens eine, für einen Fuss bestimmte Fussstütze (24) auf. Mindestens auf derjenigen Seite des Rollstuhls (10), die keine Fussstütze aufweist, ist das Rahmen-Längsteil (12) vorne weiter von der vertikalen Längsmittelebene (A) des Rollstuhls (10) beabstandet als hinten. In einer zweiten Ausführung sind Rahmen-Querteile (14) des Rollstuhls (10) so ausgebildet und angeordnet, dass mindestens auf derjenigen Seite des Rollstuhls (10), die fussstützenfrei ist, der Raum vor der Sitzfläche (27) und unter dem vorderen Bereich der Sitzfläche (27) soweit frei ist, dass der Rollstuhl (10) durch einen trippelnden Benutzer angetrieben werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/08; A61G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/12 (2013.01); A61G 5/1054 (2016.11); A61G 5/128 (2016.11)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995416 A2 20000426; EP 0995416 A3 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050305

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040924

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI