Global Patent Index - EP 0995416 A3

EP 0995416 A3 2001-01-10 - Wheelchair

Title (en)

Wheelchair

Title (de)

Rollstuhl

Title (fr)

Fauteuil roulant

Publication

EP 0995416 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99115865 A

Priority

CH 211298 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995416A2] The wheelchair (10) has at least one foot support (24). At least each side of the wheelchair which has no foot support has the longitudinal side frame member (12) projecting forwards from the vertical center plane of the wheelchair more than to the rear of the vertical plane. In another form, the lateral frame member is set so that, at least at the side of the wheelchair (10) without a foot support (24), the space in front of the seat and under the leading end of the seat is free so that the wheelchair (10) can be paddled forwards by the user's feet in a toddler action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 5/08; A61G 5/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 5/12 (2013.01); A61G 5/1054 (2016.11); A61G 5/128 (2016.11)

Citation (search report)

[AX] US 4358125 A 19821109 - CHARLES DEREK A

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995416 A2 20000426; EP 0995416 A3 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2005-08-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050305

2004-11-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040924

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010315

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI