Global Patent Index - EP 0995454 A2

EP 0995454 A2 2000-04-26 - Fluid supplying apparatus

Title (en)

Fluid supplying apparatus

Title (de)

Flüssigkeitsabgabevorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de distribution de liquide

Publication

EP 0995454 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99308313 A

Priority

JP 30238198 A

Abstract (en)

A fluid supplying apparatus having a rubber elastic film (11) with fluid contained therein, an upstream tube (30), an intermediate station (40) disposed at a distal end of the upstream tube (30) and a downstream tube (27) connected to the intermediate station (40) is provided. The upstream tube (30) has two flow paths (31A and 32A) formed in a predetermined length extending in a longitudinal direction. The intermediate station (40) has a case (41), the case (41) having a fluid outlet (51) to which the downstream tube (27) is connected, a first communicating channel (52) for intercommunicating the fluid outlet (51) and one of the flow paths (31A), a reservoir (53) in communication with the other flow path (32A), a second communicating channel (55) having a check valve (54) at an intermediate portion thereof and intercommunicating the reservoir (53) and the fluid outlet (51), and a pressing member (56) for discharging the fluid stored in the reservoir (53) to the second communicating channel (55). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 5/152

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/34 (2006.01); A61M 5/142 (2006.01); A61M 5/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61M 5/1424 (2013.01); A61M 2005/1405 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP H03505538 A 19911205

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995454 A2 20000426; EP 0995454 A3 20010117; EP 0995454 B1 20030813; CN 1172726 C 20041027; CN 1261001 A 20000726; DE 69910323 D1 20030918; DE 69910323 T2 20040617; ES 2200473 T3 20040301; JP 2000126290 A 20000509; JP 3588554 B2 20041110; KR 100610461 B1 20060809; KR 20000035063 A 20000626; TW I228427 B 20050301; US 6312411 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160913

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151013

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2200473

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2003-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910323

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-18

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-08-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2001-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-01-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7A 61M 5/152 A, 7A 61M 5/142 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI