Global Patent Index - EP 0995465 A1

EP 0995465 A1 2000-04-26 - Safety helmet and mounting arrangement for breathing mask

Title (en)

Safety helmet and mounting arrangement for breathing mask

Title (de)

Sicherheitshelm und Befestigungsvorrichtung für Beatmungsmaske

Title (fr)

Casque de protection et son dispositif d'accrochage de masque respiratoire

Publication

EP 0995465 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99410136 A

Priority

FR 9813340 A

Abstract (en)

The helmet for a fire fighter (1) has adjustable retainers for a respirator mask to allow it to be positioned in at least two positions. The retainers can each be fixed to a base (16) which is movably mounted on the helmet exterior to provide the adjustment. Each base section is attached to the sidewall of the helmet adjacent to the users ear area.

Abstract (fr)

Casque de protection (1) du type comprenant des moyens d'accrochage pour un masque respiratoire, caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend des moyens de réglage en position desdits moyens d'accrochage, permettant le positionnement de ceux-ci dans au moins deux positions et en ce que les moyens d'accrochage sont solidaires d'une pièce d'accrochage (16b) fixée à la coque du casque (1) de façon réglable pour pouvoir en modifier la position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62B 18/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A42B 3/04 (2006.01); A62B 18/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62B 18/084 (2013.01); A42B 3/288 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995465 A1 20000426; EP 0995465 B1 20030102; AT 230285 T 20030115; AU 5598099 A 20000504; BR 9904755 A 20000829; CA 2286423 A1 20000420; CA 2286423 C 20070925; CN 1130239 C 20031210; CN 1259323 A 20000712; DE 69904687 D1 20030206; DE 69904687 T2 20031023; DK 0995465 T3 20030505; DZ 2918 A1 20040301; ES 2190185 T3 20030716; FR 2784588 A1 20000421; FR 2784588 B1 20001229; JP 2000129526 A 20000509; MA 25010 A1 20000701; US 6389606 B1 20020521

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-27 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2005-08-31 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20050525

2005-08-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20041230

2005-05-25 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20041230

2005-05-25 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20041230

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-05 [PGFP CY] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Payment date: 20041105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041105

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-01 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20041101

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20041026

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-25 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-25 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20041025

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-21 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-21 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20041021

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-19 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041019

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-18 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20041018

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-14 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20041014

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-14 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20041014

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-10-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041013

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DRAEGER SAFETY AG & KGAA

2004-02-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHUBERTH HELME GMBH

2003-12-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DRAEGER SAFETY AG & KGAA

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-12-03 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHUBERTH HELME GMBH

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-10-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DRAEGER SAFETY AG & KGAA

2003-08-13 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DRAEGER SAFETY AG & KGAA

- Effective date: 20030606

2003-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2190185 T3

2003-05-19 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030401240

2003-05-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030416

2003-05-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-04-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: AMMANN PATENTANWAELTE AG BERN

2003-04-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-02-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69904687 P 20030206

2003-02-05 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-01-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: 20030102:NOT ENGLISH

2003-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 230285 T 20030115

2001-01-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001128

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-09-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000802

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI