Global patent index - EP 0995467 A1

EP 0995467 A1 2000-04-26 - Goalkeeper glove with thumb

Title (en)

Goalkeeper glove with thumb

Title (de)

Torwarthandschuh mit Daumen

Title (fr)

Gant de gardien de but avec pouce

Publication

EP 0995467 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99103657 A

Priority

DE 29818597 U

Abstract (en)

The inner thumb part (1) is covered by a latex layer (9) which is gripped by the seam (7) on the longitudinal section on the outside of the thumb and on the cusp section. The inner thumb part (1) is covered by a latex layer (9) which is gripped by the seam (7) on the longitudinal section on the outside of the thumb and on the cusp section. The inner thumb part (1) and the upper thumb part (2) form a seam butt (3) along the seam (7). A latex extension layer (12) in the form of a one-piece continuation of the latex layer (9) is bent round the seam butt (3) on the outside of the thumb. This layer (12) rests on the upper thumb part (2) and is joined to the part (2) by means of a seam (13).

Abstract (de)

Es gibt einen Torwarthandschuh, bei dem ein Innenhand-Daumenteil 1 und ein Oberhand-Daumenteil 2 entlang einem ballenseitigen Längsbereich 3 mittels Naht 6 miteinander verbunden sind und entlang der Naht 6 einen Nahtstoß bilden und bei dem der Innenhand-Daumenteil an der Außenseite von einer Latexlage 9 bedeckt ist, die am ballenseitigen Längsbereich 3 von der Naht 6 mit erfaßt ist. Dabei ist es erwünscht, wenn der ballenseitige Längsbereich des Daumen-Nahtstoßes und die Oberseite des Oberhand-Daumenteils mit relativ einfachen Mitteln in verbesserter Weise zur Abwehr eines Balles geeignet sind. Dies ist erreicht, indem eine Latexansatzlage 12 die Latexlage 9 einstückig fortsetzend um den ballenseitigen Nahtstoß 3 herumgebogen 11 ist und auf dem Oberhand-Daumenteil 2 aufliegt sowie mit diesem mittels Naht 13 verbunden ist. Der ballenseitige Nahtstoß des Daumens und ein wesentlicher Teil des Oberhand-Daumenteils sind von der Latexansatzlage bedeckt und lassen somit eine verbesserte Berührung und damit Abwehr des Balles zu. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63B 71/14; A41D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63B 71/148 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29818597 U1 20000302; EP 0995467 A1 20000426; EP 0995467 B1 20051221; US 6125473 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090225

2009-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090225

2008-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060228

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070209

2007-02-21 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-02-09 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2006-12-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060922

2006-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2006-04-01 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060401

2006-01-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2005-12-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-12-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-12-21 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051221

2005-08-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: ES FR GB IT NL

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT NL

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI