Global Patent Index - EP 0995468 A1

EP 0995468 A1 2000-04-26 - Frame for in-line skate with anti-torque bar

Title (en)

Frame for in-line skate with anti-torque bar

Title (de)

Rahmen für Einspurschuhe versehen mit einem Anti-Torsionsstab

Title (fr)

Châssis de patin en ligne équipé d'une barre anti-torsion

Publication

EP 0995468 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99118623 A

Priority

  • FR 9813400 A
  • FR 9905742 A

Abstract (en)

The chassis for an in line roller skate has a base with front (3) and rear (4) supports for the boot, each forming an inverted U-shaped cross section. The end sections of the supports extend downwardly to be connected to two cheeks (7,8) with holes for the wheels. The front and rear supports are connected by a bridge piece (10) which resists torsional distortion of the skate.

Abstract (fr)

Châssis de patin en ligne du type constitué par un corps principal (2) comprenant une base transversale munie d'au moins une surface de support avant (3) de chaussure et une surface de support arrière (4) de chaussure, chacune d'elles formant un pont avant et un pont arrière en forme de U en se prolongeant vers le bas, soit par deux portions latérales de projection (5 et 6) sur lesquelles sont rapportés deux flasques indépendantes parallèles (7 et 8) aptes à recevoir une série de roues, soit directement par lesdits flasques lorsque ceux-ci forment une pièce monolithique avec une partie supérieure transversale de liaison, caractérisé en ce que les surfaces de support avant (3) et arrière (4) de la chaussure sont reliées entre elles par une arche (10) intermédiaire pour constituer une base anti-torsion du châssis et un élément de transmission des efforts. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 17/068 (2013.01); A63C 2203/42 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995468 A1 20000426; FR 2784596 A1 20000421; FR 2784596 B1 20010302; US 6527283 B1 20030304

INPADOC legal status


2004-09-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040316

2003-12-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031103

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI NL

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI