Global Patent Index - EP 0995484 A1

EP 0995484 A1 2000-04-26 - Method of producing a gas stream of medium pressure and medium temperature from a gas stream of high pressure and high temperature as well as apparatus for carrying out the process

Title (en)

Method of producing a gas stream of medium pressure and medium temperature from a gas stream of high pressure and high temperature as well as apparatus for carrying out the process

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines Gasstromes mittleren Druckes und mittlerer Temperatur aus einem Gasstrom hohen Druckes und hoher Temperatur sowie Vorrichtung zur Durchführung des Verfahrens

Title (fr)

Méthode pour la production d'un courant de gas à moyenne pression et température moyenne à partir d'un courant de haute pression et haute température ainsi qu'un dispositif pour la réalisation de la méthode

Publication

EP 0995484 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811042 A

Priority

EP 98811042 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves reducing the energy exchange step-wise between the first gas stream (S1) and a second gas stream (S2) at lower pressure and temperature in a cascade (10) from several energy exchangers (EE1 to EE3) which are subsequently connected. The process of producing a third gas stream (S3) of average pressure and temperature involves inserting the stream as cooled air for a gas turbine. The third gas stream (S3) comprises a first gas stream (S1) of higher pressure and temperature. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus for carrying out the above process.

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Erzeugung eines dritten Gasstromes (S3) mittleren Druckes und mittlerer Temperatur, welcher insbesondere als Kühlluft für eine Gasturbine einsetzbar ist, aus einem ersten Gasstrom (S1) hohen Druckes und hoher Temperatur, wird eine hohe Effektivität bei gleichzeitig einfacher Verfahrensführung dadurch erreicht, dass die Reduzierung durch stufenweisen Energieaustausch zwischen dem ersten Gasstrom (S1) und einem zweiten Gasstrom (S2) niedrigen Druckes und niedriger Temperatur in einer Kaskade (10) aus mehreren hintereinandergeschalteten Energieaustauschem (EE1,..,EE3) vorgenommen wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B01F 3/026 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995484 A1 20000426; EP 0995484 B1 20030129; DE 59807078 D1 20030306; US 6286333 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59807078

- Effective date: 20110502

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101019

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101019

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091020

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091030

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090914

- Year of fee payment: 12

2004-01-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031030

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-05-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030422

2003-03-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807078 P 20030306

2003-01-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-01-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-09-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010806

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000927

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI