Global Patent Index - EP 0995486 A1

EP 0995486 A1 2000-04-26 - Apparatus for progressively dispensing product

Title (en)

Apparatus for progressively dispensing product

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur fortschreitenden Abgabe von Produkten

Title (fr)

Appareil pour distribuer progressivement des produits

Publication

EP 0995486 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98203607 A

Priority

EP 98203607 A

Abstract (en)

Packaging comprises a ribbon (10) formed of two sheets (11,12) in face-to-face relationship sealed together at selected locations (13) to define a plurality of closed pockets (14) therebetween. Product (28) is retained in the pockets (14). The pockets (14) may be arranged in two or more lines (15, 16) extending in the longitudinal direction of the ribbon (10). The apparatus comprises guide means (26) for guiding the ribbon along a guide path (31) to a sheet peeling device (18). Sheet take-up means (21, 22) are carried in a ribbon store (23) having a space (33) for accommodating a supply (34) of the packaging ribbon (10). A drive device (25) is carried in a receiver (24) positioned below the sheet take-up means (21, 22). Product (28) dispensed from the packaging ribbon (10) falls into the receiver (24). The drive device (25) is releasably engageable with the sheet take-up means (21, 22) to enable the ribbon store (23) and the receiver (24) to be separated from each other. Controlled amounts of product are thereby dispensed in a convenient and an environmentally friendly manner. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01F 15/04; G03D 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 69/00 (2006.01); G03D 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G03D 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995486 A1 20000426; JP 2000128137 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-27 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020103

2002-02-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AGFA-GEVAERT

2001-01-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI