Global Patent Index - EP 0995493 A2

EP 0995493 A2 2000-04-26 - Mill for granulating plastics

Title (en)

Mill for granulating plastics

Title (de)

Schneidmühle zur Zerkleinerung von Kunststoffen

Title (fr)

Granulateur de matière plastique

Publication

EP 0995493 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120229 A

Priority

DE 19847904 A

Abstract (en)

The end face (19) of the rotor shaft (11) facing an internal wall of the casing (18) carries a disc (20). Its diameter (21) is about that of the maximum rotor cutting circle. Preferred features: An annular disc (22) of similar diameter to the rotor disc, is fixed flush in the casing wall (18). Both discs are hardened steel. The gap separating them is a few tenths of a millimeter wide. Screw fastenings are used for both. An opening (25) in the annular disc, the gap (28) and a channel (26), carry off fine dust residues. The rotor axis (13) is inclined, preferably at 45 degrees (15).

Abstract (de)

Um eine Schneidmühle zur Zerkleinerung von Kunststoffen, insbesondere für die Zerkleinerung von Angüssen, mit einem mit Schneidmessern versehenen Schneidrotor (11), der innerhalb eines ebenfalls mit Messern besetzten Gehäuses umläuft, wobei die Drehachse (13) des Schneidrotors gegenüber einer Vertikalen schräggeneigt in einem Gehäuse angeordnet ist und die eine Guteinlaßöffnung (16) sowie einen Gutaustritt (17) aufweist, zu schaffen, bei der der Feinstaubanteil verringert und bei der entstehende Feinstaubreste ohne zusätzliche Vorrichtungen entfernt wird, ist gemäß der Erfindung an der der Gehäuseinnenseite (18) zugewandten Seitenfläche (19) des Schneidrotors (11) eine Scheibe (20) befestigt, deren Durchmesser in etwa dem Schneidkreisdurchmesser des Schneidrotors (11) entspricht. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/12; B02C 18/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B02C 18/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/086 (2013.01); B02C 18/144 (2013.01); B02C 18/148 (2013.01); B02C 18/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995493 A2 20000426; EP 0995493 A3 20001122; DE 19847904 C1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030501

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-08 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010518;LT PAYMENT 20010518;LV PAYMENT 20010518;MK PAYMENT 20010518;RO PAYMENT 20010518;SI PAYMENT 20010518

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010518

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 02C 18/12 A, 7B 02C 18/44 B, 7B 02C 18/14 B, 7B 02C 18/16 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI