Global Patent Index - EP 0995497 A1

EP 0995497 A1 2000-04-26 - Apparatus for generating and delivering a cascade-like jet of water

Title (en)

Apparatus for generating and delivering a cascade-like jet of water

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Erzeugung und Abgabe eines kaskadenartigen Wasserstrahls

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour former et délivrer un jet d'eau en forme de cascade

Publication

EP 0995497 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203285 A

Priority

IT TV980042 U

Abstract (en)

Apparatus for generating and delivering a cascade-like jet of water. It comprises means (12) for sucking and supplying the water to an outlet opening (16) for said jet. Between said suction and supplying means (12) and said outlet opening (16), there are provided means for accumulating the water consisting of a varied section for conveying the water flow, and means for deflecting the water flow consisting essentially of two portions of the water supply pipe, the axes thereof are inclined with respect to each other. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 1/36; A47K 3/28; B05B 9/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/04 (2006.01); B05B 1/36 (2006.01); B05B 1/34 (2006.01); B05B 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/044 (2013.01); B05B 1/36 (2013.01); B05B 1/34 (2013.01); B05B 9/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995497 A1 20000426; EP 0995497 B1 20040428; DE 69916738 D1 20040603; DE 69916738 T2 20050407; ES 2219999 T3 20041201; IT 245535 Y1 20020322; IT TV980042 U1 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111008

2013-06-04 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20130604

2012-08-16 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69916738

- Effective date: 20120501

2012-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120501

2011-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101102

2011-07-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110630

2011-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20101026

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-06-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101007

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101027

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091029

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20091026

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2219999 T3

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916738 P 20040603

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-04-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: IANNI, CARMELO

2004-04-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FURLAN, LIVIO

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030324

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI