Global Patent Index - EP 0995505 A2

EP 0995505 A2 2000-04-26 - Rolling stand

Title (en)

Rolling stand

Title (de)

Walzgerüst

Title (fr)

Cage de laminoir

Publication

EP 0995505 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120485 A

Priority

DE 19847906 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19847906C1] The tie rods (8) are suspended from the adjustment drives (3) in such a way that for asymmetric adjustment of the horizontal rolls (5) relative to the rolling line (21) they are vertically adjustable, while for symmetric adjustments of these rolls they are rotatable.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Walzgerüst, welches im wesentlichen aus einem nicht walzkraftübertragenden Führungsständer, paarweise über walzkraftübertragende Zuganker verbundenen Lagereinbaustücken für die Walzen sowie einem auf den Säulen des Führungsständers fest angeordneten Anstellgetriebe besteht. Die Aufgabe, Walzgerüste der gattungsbestimmenden Art so zu verbessern, daß neben der ansich bekannten symmetrischen Verstellung der Horizontalwalzen zur Walzlinie mittels des Anstellgetriebes auch eine asymmetrische Verstellung realisierbar ist wird dadurch gelöst, daß die Zuganker (8) vertikal verstellbar und drehbar im Anstellgetriebe (3) aufgehängt sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/04 (2006.01); B21B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/04 (2013.01); B21B 2013/106 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19847906 C1 20000330; EP 0995505 A2 20000426; EP 0995505 A3 20000816

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20021222

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020626

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21B 31/04 A, 7B 21B 31/24 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI