Global patent index - EP 0995505 A3

EP 0995505 A3 2000-08-16 - Rolling stand

Title (en)

Rolling stand

Title (de)

Walzgerüst

Title (fr)

Cage de laminoir

Publication

EP 0995505 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99120485 A

Priority

DE 19847906 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19847906C1] The tie rods (8) are suspended from the adjustment drives (3) in such a way that for asymmetric adjustment of the horizontal rolls (5) relative to the rolling line (21) they are vertically adjustable, while for symmetric adjustments of these rolls they are rotatable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 31/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/04 (2006.01); B21B 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 31/04 (2013.01); B21B 2013/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19847906 C1 20000330; EP 0995505 A2 20000426; EP 0995505 A3 20000816

INPADOC legal status

2003-05-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20021222

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020626

2001-05-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-08-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21B 31/04 A, 7B 21B 31/24 B

2000-08-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI