Global patent index - EP 0995506 A2

EP 0995506 A2 2000-04-26 - Method for controlling the tension of a section of rolled stock

Title (en)

Method for controlling the tension of a section of rolled stock

Title (de)

Zugregelverfahren für einen Walzgutabschnitt

Title (fr)

Procédé de réglage de la tension pour une section de produit laminé

Publication

EP 0995506 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99119457 A

Priority

DE 19849068 A

Abstract (en)

Drawing regulating process comprises adjusting a tension element (6) with an actual adjusting force (F) on the rolled material section (5) so that the section deviates from the tension element by an actual deviation (z), acquiring the actual adjusting force (F) and the actual deviation (z), and adjusting a pull (Z) prevailing between the front and rear roll stands (2, 3) in the material section so that the actual adjusting force is approximately the same as the theoretical adjusting force (F asterisk ) and the actual deviation (z) is approximately the same as the theoretical deviation (z asterisk ). Preferred Features: The tension element (6) is adjusted on the rolled material section using a hydraulic cylinder (7). The actual adjusting force (F) is maintained constantly the same as the theoretical adjusting force (F asterisk ) and only the actual deviation (z) is variable.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein Zugregelverfahren für einen sich zwischen einem vorderen und einem hinteren Walzgerüst (2, 3) einer Walzstraße befindlichen Walzgutabschnitt (5) eines Walzguts (1). Um auch auch bei geringen Gerüstabständen und hohen Walzgeschwindigkeiten eine zuverlässige Zugregelung zu ermöglichen, ist vorgesehen, daß ein Spannelement (6) mit einer Ist-Anstellkraft (F) an den Walzgutabschnitt (5) angestellt wird, so daß der Walzgutabschnitt (5) von dem Spannelement (6) um eine Ist-Auslenkung (z) ausgelenkt wird, daß die Ist-Anstellkraft (F) und die Ist-Auslenkung (z) erfaßt werden und daß ein zwischen dem vorderen und dem hinteren Walzgerüst (2, 3) in dem Walzgutabschnitt (5) herrschender Zug (Z) derart eingestellt wird, daß die Ist-Anstellkraft (F) sich einer Soll-Anstellkraft (F*) und/oder die Ist-Auslenkung (z) sich einer Soll-Auslenkung (z*) annähert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 37/50

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 37/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995506 A2 20000426; EP 0995506 A3 20030827; DE 19849068 A1 20000511; DE 19849068 B4 20050303; US 6199417 B1 20010313

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050119

2004-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040908

2004-05-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2000-05-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SMS DEMAG AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991022

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI