Global patent index - EP 0995509 A1

EP 0995509 A1 2000-04-26 - Bending machine

Title (en)

Bending machine

Title (de)

Biegeeinrichtung

Title (fr)

Plieuse

Publication

EP 0995509 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120602 A

Priority

DE 19847905 A

Abstract (en)

The bending device has a bending tool with at least one adjustable bending jaw (8). To produce a fold, the jaw is pivoted to a sheet table on the fixed bending jaw (7). The turning axis (S) for the adjustable bending jaw lies in the fixed bending jaw. Both jaws have bending beams in the region of their endfaces, which in their initial position bound an angle intersecting the turning axis with its bisector.

Abstract (de)

Die Biegeeinrichtung hat ein Biegewerkzeug (7, 8), das eine verstellbare Biegewange (8) aufweist. Um die Biegeeinrichtung so auszubilden, daß mit ihr auf einfache, kostengünstige Weise an Blechteilen (41) Falzungen vorgenommen werden können, die mit Abstand vom Rand des Blechteiles (41) liegen, ist die verstellbare Biegewange (8) zur Herstellung eines Falzes an einer Blechtafel (41) an einer feststehenden Biegewange (7) schwenkbar gelagert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2006.01); B21D 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 5/04 (2013.01); B21D 5/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19847905 A1 20000420; EP 0995509 A1 20000426; US 2002059819 A1 20020523; US 6640600 B2 20031104

INPADOC legal status

2005-07-27 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050125

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030710

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001017

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI