Global patent index - EP 0995514 A1

EP 0995514 A1 2000-04-26 - Panel assembly of hemmed panels and its method of manufacture

Title (en)

Panel assembly of hemmed panels and its method of manufacture

Title (de)

Aus gefalzten Blechen bestehendes Bauteil, sowie dessen Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Assemblage des paneaux sertis par pliage et un méthode de fabrication d'un tel assemblage

Publication

EP 0995514 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99307792 A

Priority

GB 9822625 A

Abstract (en)

Production of a satisfactory outer profile for a hemmed joint is often difficult due the bending of a hem being conducted without anything to provide back resistance to the bending motion. A first inner panel 4 and a method for joining the first inner panel to a second outer panel 8 are disclosed. A hem 22 of the second panel 8 is wrapped around an edge 2 of the first panel provided along at least a part of its length with a die cast bead 14 to secure the edge of the first panel within a channel 34 formed thereby in the second panel. The die cast bead 14 provides a back resistance during this bending of the hem portion about the lip of the bead. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

EPO simple patent family

GB 2342607 A 20000419; GB 2342607 B 20020911; GB 9923274 D0 19991208; DE 69908732 D1 20030717; DE 69908732 T2 20040513; EP 0995514 A1 20000426; EP 0995514 B1 20030611; GB 9822625 D0 19981209

INPADOC legal status

2016-09-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-12-01 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 69908732

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: ANDRAE WESTENDORP PATENTANWAELTE PARTNERSCHAFT, DE

2007-05-04 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TP

2004-06-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040312

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69908732

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2002-06-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: PANEL ASSEMBLY OF HEMMED PANELS AND ITS METHOD OF MANUFACTURE

2001-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010627

2001-05-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LAND ROVER GROUP LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI