Global Patent Index - EP 0995521 A1

EP 0995521 A1 2000-04-26 - Foundry moulding machine, method and use of the machine for the manufacture of sand moulds in flasks

Title (en)

Foundry moulding machine, method and use of the machine for the manufacture of sand moulds in flasks

Title (de)

Giesserei-Formmaschine, Verfahren sowie Verwendung der Formmaschine zur Herstellung kastengebundener Sandformen

Title (fr)

Machine à mouler pour fonderie, procédé et l'utilisation de la machine pour la production d'un moule en sable dans un chassis

Publication

EP 0995521 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99120305 A

Priority

DE 19848049 A

Abstract (en)

Machine has four stations, station (A) to lay fill frame on mold frame, station (B) to fill molding sand into the mold frame, station (C) to compact and remove model plate from mold and station (D) to remove fill frame from mold frame. Division of work steps between four, time-parallel operating stations, decreases cycle time and mold frame only requires slight vertical movement. The machine has four stations, in a row one behind the other, together with the mold frame transport path (12). At the first station (A), the fill frame (5) is laid on the mold frame (4). In the second station (B), the model plate (1a) is raised under the form frame (4b) and the entire mold unit is filled with molding sand (22). At the third station (C), the compress and removal from mold is performed and at the fourth station (D), the fill frame (5d) is taken from the mold frame (4d) and transported to rear of mold machine to be brought back to first station. Removed model is returned to second station. Mold frame only needs to be raised slightly from its position on transport path into processing position to fill with sand and to compress it. Molding sand is filled into the mold frame during a specific time period and continually via a transport path and via a multistage aeration unit .

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Formmaschine zur Herstellung von kastengebundenen Sandformen unter Verwendung von mindestens einem Modellplattenpaar, wobei die einzelnen Arbeitsschritte in vier geradlinig hintereinander liegenden und innerhalb der Formlinie angeordneten Stationen A, B, C, und D durchgeführt werden. Die Aufteilung der einzelnen Arbeitschritte auf die vier zeitparallel arbeitenden Stationen, wobei für die Formkästen jeweils nur sehr geringfügige vertikale Bewegungen erforderlich sind, führt zu einer wesentlichen Verkürzung der Taktzeit. Die vier Stationen werden dabei in der Reihenfolge A, B, C und D zusammen mit dem Formkastentransport auf dem Rollenbahnniveau 12 in Transportrichtung 13 taktweise durchlaufen, während die ausgesenkte Modellplatte auf dem tiefer liegenden Rollenbahnniveau 26 in entgegengesetzter Richtung von der Station C zur Station B zurück transportiert wird. In der Station A wird der Füllrahmen auf den leeren Formkasten abgelegt. In der Station B wird die Modellplatte unter den Formkasten gehoben und die so komplettierte Formeinheit unter Einwirkung eines Luftstromes mit Formsand gefüllt. In der Station C erfolgt das Verdichten und das Entformen. In der Station D wird der Füllrahmen vom geformten Formkasten abgenommen. Auf der Rückseite der Formmaschine wird der Füllrahmen wieder von der Station D zur Station A zurück transportiert. Der Quertransport der Füllrahmen von der Formmaschinenachse X zur rückseitigen Rollenbahnachse Y und umgekehrt erfolgt über die Transportwagen 72A bzw. 72D. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 11/08; B22C 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 11/08 (2006.01); B22C 25/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 11/08 (2013.01); B22C 25/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19848049 A1 20000420; AT 286790 T 20050115; DK 0995521 T3 20050523; EP 0995521 A1 20000426; EP 0995521 B1 20050112; ES 2237013 T3 20050716

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160503

2016-07-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151012

2016-05-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59911432

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131013

2015-05-06 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150506

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150223

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-16 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KUENKEL WAGNER GERMANY GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KUENKEL-WAGNER PROZESSTECHNOLOGIE GMBH, 31061 ALFELD, DE

- Document: DE 59911432

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-04-16 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911432

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20150310

2015-03-10 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59911432

- Representative's name: LEONHARD & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2014-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131031

2014-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131012

2014-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20131012

2014-05-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20131031

2013-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20121030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2013-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20121029

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-12-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20121030

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050612

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: KUNKEL-WAGNER PROZESSTECHNOLOGIE G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20051031

2006-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-03-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2006-01-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-10-12 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051012

2005-08-24 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237013 T3

2005-07-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-05-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-05-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050414

2005-04-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050412

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59911432 P 20050217

2005-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-01-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-01-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-12 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2005-01-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050112

2004-09-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KUENKEL-WAGNER PROZESSTECHNOLOGIE GMBH

2004-09-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MERTES, JOSEF

2004-03-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FOUNDRY MOULDING MACHINE, METHOD AND USE OF THE MACHINE FOR THE MANUFACTURE OF SAND MOULDS IN FLASKS

2002-10-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020905

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI