Global Patent Index - EP 0995523 A1

EP 0995523 A1 2000-04-26 - Vertical continuous casting plant with optimised molten metal level measuring

Title (en)

Vertical continuous casting plant with optimised molten metal level measuring

Title (de)

Vertikalstranggiessanlage mit optimierter Metallniveaumessung

Title (fr)

Installation de coulée continue verticale avec mesure optimisée du niveau de métal liquide

Publication

EP 0995523 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811066 A

Priority

EP 98811066 A

Abstract (en)

The measuring apparatus consists of two physically different working measuring systems (22, 26) each with a sensor (24, 28). The sensors are fixed in a predetermined position with respect to the mold (10). The first measuring system (22) has a measuring precision of at least plus or minus 2 mm in a measuring region of at least 200 mm. The second measuring system (26) has a measuring precision of at least plus or minus 0.1 mm in a measuring region of at least 20 mm. Vertical continuous casting plant comprises a mold (10) with a moving floor (14) arranged on a sinking casting plate (16), a launder system (20) for transporting a metal melt from an oven into the mold, a measuring apparatus for determining a time-dependent metal melt level (N(t)), and a through-flow regulator (30) to control the metal supply in the mold depending on the difference of a prescribed theoretical value progression Nsoll(t) and the measured time-dependent metal melt level (N(t)). The measuring apparatus consists of two physically different working measuring systems (22, 26) each with a sensor (24, 28). The sensors are fixed in a predetermined position with respect to the mold (10). The first measuring system (22) has a measuring precision of at least plus or minus 2 mm in a measuring region of at least 200 mm. The second measuring system (26) has a measuring precision of at least plus or minus 0.1 mm in a measuring region of at least 20 mm.

Abstract (de)

Vertikalstranggiessanlage, welche wenigstens eine Kokille (10) mit auf einem absenkbaren Giesstisch (16) angeordnetem Anfahrboden (14), ein Giessrinnensystem (20) zum Transport einer Metallschmelze von einem Ofen in die einzelnen Kokillen (10) und für jede Kokille (10) eine Messvorrichtung zur Bestimmung des zeitabhängigen Metallschmelzenniveaus N(t) sowie eine Durchflussregelungsvorrichtung (30) zur Steuerung der Metallzufuhr in die einzelnen Kokillen (10) in Abhängigkeit der Differenz eines vorgegebenen Sollwertverlaufes Nsoll(t) und des gemessenen zeitabhängigen Metallschmelzenniveaus N(t) enthält. Die Messvorrichtung besteht aus zwei physikalisch unterschiedlich arbeitenden Messsystemen (22, 26) mit je einem Sensor (24, 28), wobei die Sensoren (24, 28) bezüglich der Kokille (10) in einem vorbestimmten und festbleibenden Abstand fixiert sind. Das erste Messsystem (22) weist in einem Messbereich von wenigstens 200 mm eine Messgenaugkeit von mindestens ± 2 mm auf und dient zur Niveaumessung N(t) während einer ersten Füllphase der Kokille (10), und das zweite Messsystem (26) weist in einem Messbereich von wenigstens 20 mm eine Messgenauigkeit von mindestens ± 0.1 mm auf und dient zur Niveaumessung N(t) während der Endphase des Füllvorganges und der Absenkphase des Giesstisches 16. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 11/185 (2013.01); B22D 11/186 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995523 A1 20000426; AU 6340799 A 20000515; AU 749027 B2 20020613; CA 2348613 A1 20000504; EP 1133371 A1 20010919; IS 5920 A 20010418; NO 20011978 A 20010608; NO 20011978 D0 20010420; WO 0024535 A1 20000504; ZA 200102812 B 20011115

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030925

2002-07-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020618

2001-11-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALCAN TECHNOLOGY & MANAGEMENT AG

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI