Global Patent Index - EP 0995546 A1

EP 0995546 A1 2000-04-26 - Spanneinrichtung zum Festlegen eines Rohlings auf einer Brillenglasrand-Schleifmaschine

Title (en)

Spanneinrichtung zum Festlegen eines Rohlings auf einer Brillenglasrand-Schleifmaschine

Title (de)

Clamping device for fixing a blank on a spectacle lens edging machine

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage d'un palet sur une machine à déborder les verres optiques

Publication

EP 0995546 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402518 A

Priority

FR 9813262 A

Abstract (en)

The optical lens pallet mounting for an edge cutting machine has two clamping jaws to grip the faces of the pallet. One of the jaws has a plate (11) and a casing (12) coupled by a male-female connection. The spigot (18) has at least three facets (20) spaced around an axis, each with a cylindrical shape with the generatices extending orthogonally to the axis (21).

Abstract (fr)

Dispositif de serrage d'un palet sur une machine à déborder les verres optiques, du type comportant deux mors de serrage coaxiaux munis d'organes d'appui destinés à coopérer chacun avec l'une des faces du palet, l'un au moins des mors comportant un plateau (11) et un corps (12), le plateau (11) portant l'un (13) des organes d'appui et étant monté à articulation sur le corps (12), ledit montage à articulation étant réalisé par un élément mâle (18), porté par l'une (12) des deux pièces plateau-corps et coopérant avec un logement femelle (19) ménagé dans l'autre des deux pièces : l'élément mâle (18) est muni d'au moins trois facettes (20) régulièrement réparties autour d'un axe (21) qu'il présente, chacune des facettes (20) ayant une forme globalement cylindrique dont les génératrices s'étendent orthogonalement par rapport audit axe (21), de part et d'autre d'un même plan transversal (22), le logement femelle (19), du type borgne, portant des faces (24) planes parallèles à un axe qu'il présente, destinées à coopérer chacune avec l'une des facettes (20) de l'élément mâle (18) et limitées axialement par un fond (26). <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B24B 41/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 41/06 (2012.01); G02C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 41/06 (2013.01); B24B 9/146 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995546 A1 20000426; EP 0995546 B1 20020731; DE 69902333 D1 20020905; DE 69902333 T2 20030417; ES 2181378 T3 20030216; FR 2784923 A1 20000428; FR 2784923 B1 20010105; JP 2000131657 A 20000512; JP 4526140 B2 20100818; US 6231433 B1 20010515

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091014

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091013

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081016

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL CIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-10-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051013

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL CIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2003-10-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031015

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-07-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030506

2003-02-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2181378 T3

2002-09-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-09-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902333 20020905

2002-07-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-07-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011114

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000519

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI