Global Patent Index - EP 0995547 A1

EP 0995547 A1 2000-04-26 - Method for determining the groove to be made on a lens

Title (en)

Method for determining the groove to be made on a lens

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Bestimmen von einer Nut für eine Brillenglaslinse

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la détermination de la trajectoire de la rainure à usiner sur la tranche d'un verre destiné à équiper une monture de lunettes de type "semi-glace"

Publication

EP 0995547 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402576 A

Priority

FR 9813243 A

Abstract (en)

The method of determining the cutting path of a groove is formed in the edge of an optical lens. The method involves gauging the position and thus the curvature of a rigid section (12) of the upper lens frame of the spectacles to allow matching of the contour of the groove in the upper edge of the lens.

Abstract (fr)

II s'agit du montage d'un verre (20) dans l'un ou l'autre des cercles ou entourages (11) d'un monture de lunettes (10) comportant, pour chacun de ces cercles ou entourages (11), une partie rigide (12) et un fil de cerclage (13) qui s'étend de l'une à l'autre des extrémités (E1, E2) de cette partie rigide (12). Suivant l'invention, pour la portion de la trajectoire de la rainure nécessaire qui correspond à la partie rigide (12) concernée de la monture de lunettes (10), on prend systématiquement en compte la cambrure de cette partie rigide (12). Application aux montures de lunettes correspondantes. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02C 5/14 (2006.01); B24B 9/14 (2006.01); G02C 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/144 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995547 A1 20000426; EP 0995547 B1 20020403; DE 69901148 D1 20020508; DE 69901148 T2 20020822; ES 2171322 T3 20020901; FR 2784920 A1 20000428; FR 2784920 B1 20010119; JP 2000131652 A 20000512; US 6510362 B1 20030121

INPADOC legal status


2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071020

2009-01-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071020

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071019

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071019

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (CIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE)

- Effective date: 20041031

2006-12-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061016

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-10-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061011

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051019

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL (CIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE)

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2003-10-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20031031

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2171322 T3

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69901148 20020508

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020404

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010912

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI