Global Patent Index - EP 0995549 A1

EP 0995549 A1 2000-04-26 - Method for calibrating a spectacle lens grinding machine and caliper gage for such a method

Title (en)

Method for calibrating a spectacle lens grinding machine and caliper gage for such a method

Title (de)

Eich-Verfahren einer Brillenglas-Schleifmaschine und Eichkaliber zu dessen Ausführung

Title (fr)

Procédé pour l'étalonnage d'une meuleuse pour lentille ophtalmique, et calibre d'étalonnage propre à sa mise en oeuvre

Publication

EP 0995549 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99402590 A

Priority

FR 9813242 A

Abstract (en)

The method is for calibrating an optical lens grinding tool which has a tilting support (11) mounted on a frame with a lens support shaft (12). The support with a calibrator is closed with the tool (14) shaft (13). The closing movement is interrupted when the calibrator and tool make contact. There is an independent claim

Abstract (fr)

Il s'agit de l'étalonnage d'une meuleuse comportant une bascule (11), qui est montée pivotante sur un bâti, un arbre porte-verre (12), qui est monté rotatif sur la bascule (11), et un arbre porte-outil (13, 13'), qui est monté rotatif sur le bâti, et sur lequel peut être monté un outil d'usinage (14, 14'), suivant un procédé comportant une phase d'accostage au cours de laquelle la bascule (11), équipée d'un calibre d'étalonnage, est rapprochée de l'arbre porte-outil (13, 13'), équipé, lui, d'un outil d'usinage (14, 14'). Suivant l'invention, on interrompt cette phase d'accostage dès qu'un contact, et, préférentiellement, un contact électrique, est détecté entre le calibre d'étalonnage et l'outil d'usinage (14, 14'), en choisissant préférentiellement pour ce faire un calibre d'étalonnage comportant au moins en surface une partie conductrice isolée. Application aux meuleuses pour lentilles ophtalmiques. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 9/14; B24B 47/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 9/14 (2006.01); B24B 47/22 (2006.01); G02C 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 47/225 (2013.01); B24B 9/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995549 A1 20000426; EP 0995549 B1 20040414; DE 69916394 D1 20040519; DE 69916394 T2 20040909; ES 2218967 T3 20041116; FR 2784919 A1 20000428; FR 2784919 B1 20010209; JP 2000127015 A 20000509; JP 4468520 B2 20100526; US 6327790 B1 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091021

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110302

2011-03-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110303

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081229

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081007

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL CIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *ESSILOR INTERNATIONAL CIE GENERALE D'OPTIQUE

- Effective date: 20041031

2005-04-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050117

2004-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2218967 T3

2004-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041031

2004-10-13 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69916394 P 20040519

2004-04-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2004-04-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-04-14 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-04-14 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040414

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES GB IT

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI