Global Patent Index - EP 0995560 A2

EP 0995560 A2 2000-04-26 - Machine for transversely cutting webs

Title (en)

Machine for transversely cutting webs

Title (de)

Querschneider für Bahnmaterialien

Title (fr)

Machine pour la coupe transversale de matériaux en bande

Publication

EP 0995560 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120489 A

Priority

DE 19848973 A

Abstract (en)

The cross-cutter has at least one cutter shaft (13) with a cutter block (19) extending axially over a large part of a cutting region (48), with at least one peripheral blade held in a carrier. The shaft ends (14) are engaged by bearings (12) and/or a drive (17) and are connected to the specially manufactured cutter block. At least one shaft end is made of high strength material, esp. steel, with a flange (16) facing the cutter block, extending essentially to the periphery of the block and connected to it in force and/or shape locking manner.

Abstract (de)

Ein Querschneider für Bahnmaterialien, insbesondere Papier besitzt eine Messerwelle (13), die aus einer Leichtmetall-Messerwalze (19) und einem Stahl-Wellenende 14 zusammengesetzt ist. Dieses besteht aus einem Lager (12) und Antrieb (17) aufnehmenden Zapfen und einem Flansch (16), der mittels einer kraftschlüssigen und formschlüssigen Verbindung mit der Messerwalze verbunden ist. Zur kraftschlüssigen Verbindung werden Schraubbolzen (35) in Buchsen (33) eingesetzt, die in entsprechende Ausnehmungen der Messerwalze eingeschraubt und eingeklebt sind. Zusätzlich wird eine Paßbolzenverbindung vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26D 7/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26D 1/36 (2006.01); B26D 7/26 (2006.01); B65H 35/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/265 (2013.01); B26D 7/2614 (2013.01); Y10T 83/4795 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9372 (2015.04); Y10T 83/9464 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995560 A2 20000426; EP 0995560 A3 20010516; EP 0995560 B1 20040506; AT 265916 T 20040515; DE 19848973 A1 20000427; ES 2221288 T3 20041216; JP 2000141283 A 20000523; US 6308605 B1 20011030

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141016

2015-11-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20151126

2015-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141015

2015-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150501

2015-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909389

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131023

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20131029

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131021

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111015

2012-12-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 265916 T

- Effective date: 20111015

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101014

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2221288 T3

2004-11-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20040506

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909389 P 20040609

2004-05-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2004-05-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030307

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE ES GB IT

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES GB IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI