Global patent index - EP 0995562 A1

EP 0995562 A1 2000-04-26 - A device for forming ceramic products such as tiles and the like, by powder pressing

Title (en)

A device for forming ceramic products such as tiles and the like, by powder pressing

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von keramischen Gegenständen wie Fliesen und dergleichen durch Pressen von Pulver

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication d'éléments en céramique tels que carreaux et produits similaires par pressage de poudre

Publication

EP 0995562 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98119426 A

Priority

EP 98119426 A

Abstract (en)

The device for forming ceramic products, such as tiles and the like, by pressing of powders or other materials having prevalently plastic characteristics, comprises: a lower body (2) bearing a support surface (20); an upper body (3) provided with at least one active surface (30) arranged facing the support surface (20); at least one shaping frame (4) predisposed in such a way as to perimetrally delimit the at least one active surface (30) and to be mobile with respect to the upper body (3) so as to be able to project inferiorly from the at least one active surface (30); means for depositing a powder layer (5) between the lower body (2) and the upper body (3); the lower body (2) and the upper body (3) being reciprocally mobile in a perpendicular direction to the support surface (20) and the at least one active surface (30) so as to be able to exert on command a pressing force on at least a part of the layer of powders (5) to give the part a permanent shape. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B28B 13/02 (2006.01); B30B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28B 13/0215 (2013.01); B28B 3/021 (2013.01); B28B 3/027 (2013.01); B30B 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995562 A1 20000426

INPADOC legal status

2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021206

2002-09-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020726

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000828

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT PT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI