Global Patent Index - EP 0995588 A3

EP 0995588 A3 2000-05-31 - Apparatus for manufacturing bags, sachets or the like from a thermoplastic web

Title (en)

Apparatus for manufacturing bags, sachets or the like from a thermoplastic web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Beuteln, Säcken oder dergleichen aus einer thermoplastischen Kunststoffolienbahn

Title (fr)

Appareil pour la fabrication de sacs, sachets ou analogues à partir d'un film thermoplastique

Publication

EP 0995588 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99119273 A

Priority

DE 19848412 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0995588A2] The appts. to produce bags and sacks and the like, from a web of thermoplastic film, has a roller feed to bring the film web in steps into a welding station. At the welding station, where the web is welded and cut laterally, the tines (10) of an air blowing unit blow and align the cut film bags away from the film web, at the lower welding roller (7). The cut bags are blown towards the leading ends of the paddle arms (13) of a paddle wheel. An air guide body (15) gives the transfer movement for the cut bags from the welding station into the paddle wheel assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/02; B31B 19/92

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 1/02 (2006.01); B31B 1/64 (2006.01); B31B 19/92 (2006.01); B31B 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/00 (2013.01); B31B 2219/028 (2013.01); B31B 2219/92 (2013.01); B31B 2237/10 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[X] US 4573955 A 19860304 - MORY STEVEN W [US], et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995588 A2 20000426; EP 0995588 A3 20000531; BR 9904697 A 20031118; DE 19848412 A1 20000504; DE 19848412 C2 20010301; JP 2000127257 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-10-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010914

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-05-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 19/02 A, 7B 31B 19/92 B

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI