Global Patent Index - EP 0995596 A1

EP 0995596 A1 2000-04-26 - Device and method and for carrying out a flying printing plate exchange

Title (en)

Device and method and for carrying out a flying printing plate exchange

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Durchführung eines fleigenden Plattenwechsels

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour la mise en oeuvre d'un changement de plaques en marche

Publication

EP 0995596 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99117404 A

Priority

US 17459598 A

Abstract (en)

The method for changing a printing plate in a printer of a web-fed printing press possessing an offset blanket cylinder and a plate cylinder supporting the printing plate involves taking off the plate cylinder (260) from the offset blanket cylinder (250) and braking the plate cylinder until it stops. The press roll (300) is placed on the peripheral surface of the plate cylinder. One end of the printing plate is raised by means of a suction appliance or by hand, and the printing plate is pulled out when the press roll is placed in position by rotating the plate cylinder.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Rollenrotationsdruckmaschine, bei der zur Durchführung eines Plattenwechsels die Druckplatte (500) in Kontakt mit einer Preßwalze (300) gebracht wird, die die Druckplatte (500) während des Plattenwechsels gegen den Plattenzylinder (260) drückt. Hierdurch kann der Abstand zwischen dem Gummituchzylinder (250) und dem Plattenzylinder (260) im Falle eines fliegenden Plattenwechsels sehr klein gehalten werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 7/02 (2006.01); B41F 13/24 (2006.01); B41F 13/42 (2006.01); B41F 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/1206 (2013.01); B41P 2227/62 (2013.01); B41P 2227/63 (2013.01); Y10S 101/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19942617 A1 20000420; DE 59906248 D1 20030814; EP 0995596 A1 20000426; EP 0995596 B1 20030709; JP 2000117941 A 20000425; US 6125757 A 20001003

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-04-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59906248

2015-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140929

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-08-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110907

2012-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110930

2012-06-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20120531

2012-05-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110907

2012-04-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100927

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2010-10-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20100930

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-11-11 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-11-03 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2004-06-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040414

2004-05-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-09-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-08-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59906248 P 20030814

2003-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-07-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2003-07-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020627

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB LI

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000229

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI