EP 0995600 A3 20011212 - Ink jet recording head, ink jet apparatus provided with the same, and ink jet recording method
Title (en)
Ink jet recording head, ink jet apparatus provided with the same, and ink jet recording method
Title (de)
Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungskopf, damit ausgestattetes Tintenstrahlgerät und Tintenstrahlaufzeichnungsverfahren
Title (fr)
Tête d'enregistrement à jet d'encre, appareil à jet d'encre equipé de celle-ci, et méthode d'enregistrement à jet d'encre
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 27788198 A 19980930
- JP 18939499 A 19990702
- JP 26564999 A 19990920
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0995600A2] This invention provides an ink jet recording head for discharging an ink droplet using the thermal energy of heating means. According to the present invention, the heating means is a heating device having the Metal-Insulator-Metal type current-voltage properties in which the resistance value on the application of a low voltage exhibits a value higher than the resistance value on the application of a high voltage, regardless of the polarity. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/05 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01); H01L 45/00 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
B41J 2/14072 (2013.01 - EP US); B41J 2/14129 (2013.01 - EP US); B41J 2202/03 (2013.01 - EP US); H10N 70/00 (2023.02 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [X] EP 0493897 A2 19920708 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]
- [X] EP 0432982 A1 19910619 - CANON KK [JP]
- [X] EP 0641656 A2 19950308 - CANON KK [JP]
- [Y] US 4523811 A 19850618 - OTA TADASHI [JP]
- [Y] US 5335101 A 19940802 - REAMEY ROBERT H [US]
- [Y] US 5144288 A 19920901 - HAMADA HIROSHI [JP], et al
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 10 31 August 1998 (1998-08-31)
- [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 11 30 September 1998 (1998-09-30)
- [Y] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 016, no. 492 (E - 1278) 12 October 1992 (1992-10-12)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0995600 A2 20000426; EP 0995600 A3 20011212; EP 0995600 B1 20081126; DE 69939966 D1 20090108; JP 2001071499 A 20010321; US 6386685 B1 20020514
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 99119394 A 19990929; DE 69939966 T 19990929; JP 26564999 A 19990920; US 40730299 A 19990929