Global patent index - EP 0995615 A1

EP 0995615 A1 2000-04-26 - Manual writing or dispensing device

Title (en)

Manual writing or dispensing device

Title (de)

Handschreib- oder Auftraggerät

Title (fr)

Instrument manuel pour écrire ou pour applicateur

Publication

EP 0995615 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99710009 A

Priority

DE 29819071 U

Abstract (en)

The chamber (6,7) in the housing has at least one wall in the form of a bubble (8) of flexible, non-elastic material connected to the rear end of the writing point (4). In the housing is a storage space for free writing fluid, which is closed in a fluid-tight manner to the atmosphere, whilst the fluid contained in it remains under the effect of atmospheric pressure. A valve device (15) is located between the chamber (6,7) and the closed storage space and when a lower state of fill is reached in the chamber it opens by means of the wall of the bubble and closes when an upper state of fill in the chamber is achieved.

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Handschreib- oder -auftraggerät beschrieben, welches mit einem halterschaftförmigen Gehäuse (1), einer am vorderen Ende vorgesehenen, in Berührung mit einer Schreib- oder Zeichenunterlage bringbaren Schreibspitze (4), einer im Gehäuse (1) angeordneten Kammer (6,7) für freie Schreibflüssigkeit, die mindestens eine Wand in Form einer Blase (8) aus flexiblem, unelastischem Material aufweist und mit dem hinteren Ende der Schreibspitze (4) in Verbindung steht. Im Gehäuse (1) ist ein Vorratsraum (2) für freie Schreibflüssigkeit angeordnet, der gegenüber der Umgebungsluft flüssigkeitsdicht verschlossen ist, während die in ihm enthaltene Schreibflüssigkeit unter der Wirkung des Umgebungsdruckes steht. Es ist eine Ventileinrichtung (15) zwischen der Kammer (6,7) und dem - abgesehen von seinen Verbindungen zu Schreibspitze (4) und Ventileinrichtung (15)- geschlossenen Vorratsraum (2), die bei Erreichen eines unteren Füllstandes in der Kammer (6,7) mittels der Wand der Blase (8) geöffnet und beim Erreichen eines oberen Füllstandes in der Kammer (6,7) geschlossen wird. Hierbei steht der Innenraum (9) der Blase (8) mit der Umgebungsluft in Verbindung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43K 5/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43K 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43K 5/1836 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 4313180 C2 19950427 - ROTRING INT GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29819071 U1 20000302; EP 0995615 A1 20000426; EP 0995615 B1 20040121; US 6106180 A 20000822

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160927

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150929

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150917

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100921

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090928

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59908354

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-02-26

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040121

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020715

2002-06-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BEROL CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERKA, GEROLD

2001-02-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ANDERKA, GEROLD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-02-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-02-07 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ANDERKA, GEROLD

2001-01-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR IT

2000-05-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000328

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI