Global Patent Index - EP 0995671 A2

EP 0995671 A2 2000-04-26 - Boat with two hulls

Title (en)

Boat with two hulls

Title (de)

Doppelrumpfboot

Title (fr)

Bateau avec deux coques

Publication

EP 0995671 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99120791 A

Priority

  • DE 19848761 A
  • DE 29901492 U
  • DE 29906514 U
  • DE 19848763 A
  • DE 29912638 U

Abstract (en)

The catamaran sailing boat, with two hulls (10,22), has spars (18) between them supporting a rig of at least one mast (12) with a sail (14). The smaller hull (22) acts as the boom, remaining on the windward side. The upper section of the rig has a block and tackle mainsheet (24), to the boom hull (22) of the boat, which counteracts forces working on the foot of the mast.

Abstract (de)

Doppelrumpfboot mit zwei Rümpfen (10, 22), einer Verbindung (18) zwischen diesen, einem Rigg aus wenigstens Mast (12) und einem daran befestigten Segel (14), wobei ein als Ausleger dienender kleinerer Rumpf (22) stets in Luv verbleibt, und die Rümpfe (10, 22) durch Verbindungsspieren (18) miteinander verbunden sind, und zum Rigg in einem oberen Bereich eine taljenartige Hauptschot (24) zum Boot vorgesehen ist, die gegen eine Verspannung des beweglich angeordneten Mastfußes wirkt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 1/12; B63H 9/06; B63H 9/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/12 (2006.01); B63B 1/14 (2006.01); B63B 7/02 (2006.01); B63B 15/02 (2006.01); B63H 9/06 (2006.01); B63H 9/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 1/121 (2013.01); B63B 1/14 (2013.01); B63B 7/02 (2013.01); B63B 15/02 (2013.01); B63H 9/06 (2013.01); B63H 9/10 (2013.01); B63B 2001/102 (2013.01); B63B 2015/0058 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0995671 A2 20000426; EP 0995671 A3 20020130; DE 19950625 A1 20000621

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-11-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020601

2002-10-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI